IL SB1691 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Safety-Net Hospital Service Loan Forgiveness Program Fund. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to establish the Safety-Net Hospital Service Loan Forgiveness Program to make loan repayment disbursements to physicians and medical residents, as defined, who agree to practice in a Safety-Net Hospital. Requires physicians and medical residents who are selected to participate in the Program to agree, by contract, to serve a minimum 3-year full-time service obligation. Requires the Department to make annual disbursements directly to the selected physician or medical resident equivalent to 35% of the average educational debt for indebted graduates in his or her profession not to exceed the balance of the physician or medical resident's qualifying educational loans. Provides that before receiving loan repayment disbursements and as requested, the physician or medical resident must complete a confirmation of practice form verifying that he or she is practicing as required under the Program. Provides that if a physician or medical resident fails to fulfill the required minimum commitment of service, the Department shall collect the total amount paid to the physician or medical resident under the Program plus interest and shall deposit such moneys into the Safety-Net Hospital Service Loan Forgiveness Program Fund. Requires the Department to adopt any rules necessary to implement the Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SAFETY-NET HOSP-LOAN PROGRAM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 006-000-000
2017-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Human Services
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Human Services
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Human Services
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text
305512-4.51New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback