IL SB1690 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that a person charged with an offense shall be allowed counsel at the hearing at which bail is determined under the Code. Provides that if the defendant desires counsel for his or her initial appearance but is unable to obtain counsel, the court shall appoint a public defender or licensed attorney at law of this State to represent him or her for purposes of that hearing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-BAIL HEARING-COUNSEL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-04-27HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
2017-03-08SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255109-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback