IL SB1688 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Department of Health and Human Services Act and amends various Acts. Abolishes the Department of Human Services, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, and the Department on Aging and transfers the functions of those agencies to the Department of Health and Human Services, which is created. Provides that the Secretary of Health and Human Services is the head of the new agency and transfers the staffs, records, and unexpended funds of the abolished agencies to the Department of Health and Human Services. Provides that the Secretary of Health and Human Services shall take all steps necessary to accomplish administrative efficiencies, staff reductions, containment of costs, and reallocation of existing resources and that the Secretary shall submit a report on those accomplishments to the General Assembly and the Governor. Makes conforming changes in other Acts. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
DEPT HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-05 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (HS) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1688&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1688.htm |