IL SB1684 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Illinois Architecture Practice Act of 1989 from January 1, 2020 to January 1, 2030. Amends the Illinois Architecture Practice Act of 1989. Removes language requiring an applicant who has graduated from an architectural program outside the United States or its territories and whose first language is not English to submit certification of passage of the Test of English as a Foreign Language and a test of spoken English. Removes obsolete language in provisions concerning qualifications for licensure. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ARCHITECTURE PRACTICE-SUNSET

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-12HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-12HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-04-12HouseArrived in House
2019-04-12SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2019
2019-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities; 007-000-000
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22530511Amended CodeCitation Text
22530513Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.30Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.40New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback