IL SB1683 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. Provides that 1% of the school facility occupation taxes collected shall be distributed to the regional superintendent of schools (currently, these moneys are deposited into the Tax Compliance and Administration Fund) to cover the costs in administering and enforcing the provisions of the school facility occupation taxes Section of the Code. Effective July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCHOOL FACILITY OCCUP REVENUE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2021-03-09SenateAssigned to Revenue
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5555-1006.7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback