IL SB1681 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that each rail carrier that contracts with a contract carrier for the transportation of its employees in the course of their employment shall verify that the contract carrier has hit and run, uninsured, and underinsured motor vehicle coverage in an amount not less than $500,000 per passenger.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-CARRIER-INSURANCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee; 010-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-05-16HouseAssigned to Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-05-11HouseArrived in House
2017-05-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2017
2017-05-05SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Insurance; 010-000-000
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Insurance
2017-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-02-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62558-101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback