IL SB1680 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Governmental Employees Political Rights Act. Provides that a member of any police department or Sheriff's department (as well as a member of any fire department or fire protection district) may be a candidate for or appointed to any public office. Further provides that a police officer or Sheriff's deputy (as well as a firefighter) who is elected to the Illinois General Assembly shall be granted a leave of absence from his or her employer without compensation during his or her term of office. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCGOV EMPLOYEE RIGHTS
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] | Rep. Michael Madigan [D] | Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] |
Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1160 |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-12-04 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 050-001-000 |
2014-12-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 050-001-000 |
2014-12-03 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 010-000-000 |
2014-12-03 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 010-000-000 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government |
2014-11-26 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-11-26 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link |
2014-11-26 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-11-26 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 - November 20, 2014 |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 |
2014-11-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2014-11-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2014-11-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2014-11-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2014-11-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-11-10 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2014-11-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2014-11-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2014-11-06 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-06 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-12-20 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-12-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-12-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2013-11-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 20, 2013 |
2013-11-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-11-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-11-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-11-04 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2013 |
2013-11-04 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Safety: Police & Fire Committee; 021-002-000 |
2013-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Public Safety: Police & Fire Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-05-22 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-05-21 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2013-05-21 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Public Safety: Police & Fire Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Safety: Police & Fire Committee |
2013-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned to Public Safety: Police & Fire Committee |
2013-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2013-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 031-017-000 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Link |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-003-000 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported Back To Executive; 002-000-000 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 135 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |