IL SB1674 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Park District Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that in those cases where the injury or death for which a disability or death benefit is payable was caused under circumstances creating a legal liability on the part of some person or entity to pay damages to the disabled employee, then legal proceedings may be taken against that other person or entity to recover damages, notwithstanding the fund's payment, of or liability to pay, disability or death benefits. Provides that the fund may intervene in any action brought by the disabled employee or his or her personal representative. Authorizes the fund to bring an action against the third party for the recovery of all damages on account of injuries caused to the employee if the employee has not brought such an action within a specified period of time.
Title
PEN CD-CHIC PARKS-SUBROGATION
Sponsors
Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Pensions and Investments |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Postponed - Pensions and Investments |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Postponed - Pensions and Investments |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions and Investments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 12-190.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1674&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB1674.htm |