IL SB1672 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Community Emergency Services and Support Act. Replaces the term "responder" with "mobile crisis response team member" in the Act. Removes provisions concerning responder involvement in involuntary commitment, and makes other changes in provisions concerning State prohibitions relating to emergency response. Provides that the Division of Mental Health's guidance for 9-1-1 PSAPs and emergency services dispatched through 9-1-1 PSAPs shall promote, to the greatest extent practicable, referrals to a prearrest or prebooking case management unit in any area served by a prearrest or prebooking case management unit. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EMERGENCY SERVICES&SUPPORT ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2023-03-23SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023
2023-03-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023
2023-03-08SenatePostponed - Behavioral and Mental Health
2023-02-21SenateAssigned to Behavioral and Mental Health
2023-02-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-02-08SenateFirst Reading
2023-02-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5075415Amended CodeCitation Text
5075425Amended CodeCitation Text
5075430Amended CodeCitation Text
5075435Amended CodeCitation Text
5075440Amended CodeCitation Text
507545Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback