IL SB1672 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that a craft distiller license and a craft distiller tasting permit license shall allow the sale and offering for sale at retail for use and consumption on the premises specified in the license any form of alcoholic liquor purchased from a licensed distributor or importing distributor. Provides that a craft distiller tasting permit license allows the licensee to sell and offer for sale at retail, but not for resale in any form, up to 5,000 gallons of transferred alcoholic liquor to the extent approved by the Illinois Liquor Control Commission. Provides that upon approval from the State Commission, a craft distiller tasting permit license shall allow the licensee to sell and offer for sale at (i) the craft distiller's licensed premises and (ii) at up to 2 additional locations for use and consumption and not for resale. Provides that certain craft distillers may sell up to 10,000 gallons (instead of 2,500 gallons) of spirits to non-licensees. Creates a craft distiller warehouse permit. Provides that a craft distiller warehouse permit license may be issued to the holder of a craft distiller tasting permit license and shall allow the holder to store or warehouse up to 500,000 gallons of spirits manufactured by the holder of the permit. Establishes fees for a craft distiller warehouse permit. Makes other changes.
Title
LIQUOR-CRAFT DISTILLER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 3-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 6-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |