IL SB1671 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $25,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Supreme Court to be distributed to counties for expenses for direct mental health services provided to individuals and families participating in mental health courts, or on standard adult and juvenile probation caseloads. Appropriates $9,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Supreme Court for the establishment and maintenance of crisis intervention mental health care units for regional use and availability by probation departments for adults and juveniles in need of immediate care and placement. Effective July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$SUPREME COURT-MENTAL HEALTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-26SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2023-02-21SenateAssigned to Appropriations
2023-02-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-02-08SenateFirst Reading
2023-02-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback