IL SB1671 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Community College Act. With respect to the name of the board of a community college district, removes the requirement that the county or counties be listed when referring to the common name of the community college and provides that the district number may (instead of shall) be incorporated in the board's name. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COM COL DIST-COMMON NAME

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-28SenateSent to the Governor
2017-07-01SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-07-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 049-000-000
2017-07-01Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-31SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2017-05-31HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2017-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 012-000-000
2017-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-04-27HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
2017-03-08SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 008-000-000
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1108053-11Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback