IL SB1669 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0561
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Requires the Department of the Lottery, beginning on January 1, 2020 or as soon thereafter as is practical, to offer a special instant scratch-off game to benefit school technology. Requires the net revenue from that game to be deposited into the School Technology Revolving Loan Fund. Provides that moneys received from the scratch-off game shall be used by the State Board of Education to fund grants for school technology. Authorizes the Department to adopt rules necessary to implement and administer the game. Defines "net revenue". Amends the School Code to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOTTERY-SCRATCH-OFF-SCHOOLS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0561
2019-08-23SenateEffective Date August 23, 2019
2019-08-23SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-001-001
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2019
2019-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-003-000
2019-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-000-000
2019-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-03-28HouseArrived in House
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 038-003-000
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 018-000-000
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-03-13SenatePostponed - Executive
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-03-06SenatePostponed - Executive
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.117aAmended CodeCitation Text
2016052Amended CodeCitation Text
20160520Amended CodeCitation Text
20160521.12New CodeSee Bill Text
2016059.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1669&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1669.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1669eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1669enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0561.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1669sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1669ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1669_03282019_025000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB1669_05282019_025000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1669ham001_05302019_040000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback