IL SB1668 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0457
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0457
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Natural Resources to make certain real estate conveyances in McHenry County, Lake County, Bureau County, and Cook County, subject to specified conditions. Authorizes the Department of Transportation to make certain real estate conveyances in Ogle County, Pike County, Madison County, St. Clair County, and Woodford County. Effective immediately.
Title
DNR-IDOT-CONVEY REAL ESTATE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0457 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2017-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Tim Bivins |
2017-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Tim Bivins |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2017-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-001 |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-04-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 012-000-000 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins |