IL SB1667 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0570
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0570
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Title Insurance Act. In provisions concerning reinsurance, provides that a title insurance company may obtain reinsurance for all or any part of its liability under one or more of its title insurance policies from an assuming insurer with a financial strength rating of A- or better from A.M. Best Company, Inc., or with an alternative rating the Department of Insurance may approve that the Department determines is an equivalent rating by another recognized rating organization. In provisions concerning retained liability, provides that the net retained liability of a title insurance company for a single risk on property located in the State, whether assumed directly or as reinsurance, may not exceed the total surplus (rather than 50% of the total surplus) to policyholders as shown in the most recent annual statement of the title insurance company on file with the Department. Provides that each title insurance company shall file annually with the Department a notice describing its professional reinsurance business, if any, and describing how risks are placed through reinsurance outside of the title insurance industry.
Title
TITLE INS-REINSURANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0570 |
2017-12-15 | Senate | Effective Date June 1, 2018 |
2017-12-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-11-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-002 |
2017-10-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017 |
2017-10-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Table Amendment - Tabled |
2017-10-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Table Amendment - Tabled |
2017-10-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-10-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-10-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-10-26 | House | Reported Back To Executive Committee; |
2017-10-26 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Executive Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-10-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Table Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Table Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-10-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-10-23 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-10-17 | House | To Gaming Subcommittee |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-05-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-08 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-05-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-001 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Haine |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 155 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 155 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |