IL SB1664 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Video Gaming Act. Provides for the licensure of a motorsports park under the Act. Provides that a licensed motorsports park may operate up to 200 video gaming terminals on its premises at any time. Requires the owner of the licensed motorsports park to enter into a written use agreement with a terminal operator for placement of the terminals. Makes conforming changes in provisions concerning receipt tickets, licensure of terminals, issuance of licenses and license fees, the necessity of a liquor license for licensure, location of terminals, and imposition of a tax. Effective immediately.
Title
VIDEO GAMING-MOTORSPORTS PARK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Postponed - Gaming |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Gaming |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Gaming |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 40 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 58 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1664&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1664.htm |