IL SB1660 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that no medical provider shall be reimbursed for a supply of prescriptions filled outside of a licensed pharmacy except when there exists no licensed pharmacy within 5 miles of the prescribing physician's practice. Provides that, if there exists no licensed pharmacy within 5 miles of the prescribing physician's practice, no medical provider shall be reimbursed for a prescription, the supply of which lasts for longer than 72 hours from the date of injury or 24 hours from the date of first referral to the medical service provider, whichever is greater, filled and dispensed outside of a licensed pharmacy. Provides that the limitations on filling and dispensing prescriptions do not apply if there exists a pre-arranged agreement between the medical provider and a preferred provider program regarding the filling of prescriptions outside a licensed pharmacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WORKER COMP-FILL PRESCRIPTIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Tort Reform
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8203058.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback