IL SB1658 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Personnel Record Review Act, the Right to Privacy in the Workplace Act, the Minimum Wage Law, the Equal Pay Act of 2003, the Illinois Wage Payment and Collection Act, the One Day Rest In Seven Act, the School Visitation Rights Act, the Victims' Economic Security and Safety Act, the Employee Classification Act, the Workers' Compensation Act, and the Workers' Occupational Diseases Act. Provides that, for purposes of those Acts, one or both of the terms "employ" and "employee" have the meanings ascribed to those terms in the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938. Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act to provide that the term "employment" during years in which the Bond Obligation under the Illinois Unemployment Insurance Trust Fund Act has been reduced to zero does not include services performed by an individual who has been proven in any proceeding where such issue is involved that his or her compensation is not subject to federal wage withholding. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EMPLOY FAIR LABOR DEFINITIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-09SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (LA)
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8201053Amended CodeCitation Text
8201125Amended CodeCitation Text
8201152Amended CodeCitation Text
8201401Amended CodeCitation Text
82014710Amended CodeCitation Text
82018010Amended CodeCitation Text
82018510Repealed CodeCitation Text
82018515Amended CodeCitation Text
82018520Amended CodeCitation Text
82018525Amended CodeCitation Text
8201855Amended CodeCitation Text
8203051Amended CodeCitation Text
8203101Amended CodeCitation Text
820401Amended CodeCitation Text
820405211.4Amended CodeCitation Text
820405212Amended CodeCitation Text
820553New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback