IL SB1657 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Weights and Measures Act. Provides continuing education requirements for persons registered to install, service, recondition, or repair a weighing or measuring device used in trade or commerce. Provides for a phase-in process to apply continuing education requirements for persons currently registered to install, service, recondition, or repair a weighing or measuring device used in trade or commerce. Provides that applications and reports shall be filed in a manner prescribed by the Director of Agriculture (currently, in writing). Defines "continuing education course". Makes other changes.
Title
WEIGHTS&MEASURES-CONTINUING ED
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0217 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-003-000 |
2021-05-14 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2021 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 013-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 470 | 8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |