IL SB1657 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Gun Dealer Licensing Act. Provides that it is unlawful for a person to engage in the business of selling, leasing, or otherwise transferring firearms without a license issued by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Provides that a dealership agent other than a dealer licensee-in-charge may act on behalf of the licensed dealership without being licensed as a dealer under the Act. Creates the Gun Dealer Licensing Board consisting of 5 members appointed by the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation to recommend policies, procedures, and rules relevant to the administration and enforcement of the Act. Provides that the holder of a dealership license issued under the Act may employ in the conduct of his or her business dealership agents. Establishes qualifications for obtaining dealership licenses and for being employed as a dealership agent. Establishes penalties for violations of the Act. Provides for rulemaking, including emergency rulemaking. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Provides that the Act is repealed on January 1, 2028. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GUN DEALER LICENSING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 30 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-17HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-16HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 007-006-000
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-05-08HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 030-021-001
2017-04-27SenateVerified
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
2017-04-27SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-004-000
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 007-005-000
2017-03-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-03-14SenateReported Back To Judiciary; 002-001-000
2017-03-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Firearms
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-16SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51005-45Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.38New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback