IL SB1655 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends Public Act 94-653. Authorizes the Department of Natural Resources to convey and quitclaim certain property to the Chicago Park District. Amends Public Act 101-361. Changes the description of property transferred to the City of Wyoming by the Department of Natural Resources. Changes the description of property exchanged between Pulaski County and the Department of Natural Resources. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DNR LAND TRANSFER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
2021-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary
2021-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
2021-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2021
2021-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2021-05-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-002-000
2021-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021
2021-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-05-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 015-000-000
2021-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2021-05-18HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-18HouseRemoved from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Dan Brady
2021-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris
2021-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-13HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-13HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Executive Committee; 014-000-000
2021-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2021-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-05-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-05-04HouseFirst Reading
2021-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris
2021-04-23HouseArrived in House
2021-04-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2021-04-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Joyce
2021-04-22SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000
2021-03-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2021-03-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-03-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
2021-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 23, 2021
2021-03-17SenateSecond Reading
2021-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2021
2021-03-16SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
2021-03-09SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback