IL SB1654 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that whenever a hospital notifies a managed care organization that a medical assistance enrollee has a discharge order from the attending physician and is ready for discharge from an inpatient hospital stay to another level of care, the managed care organization must secure the enrollee's placement in or transfer to another facility within 24 hours of receiving the hospital's notification. Provides that in addition to any payments for which the managed care organization is responsible through the designated discharge date, a managed care organization that fails to comply with the requirement shall reimburse the hospital for each additional inpatient day beyond the designated discharge date until the enrollee is actually discharged at a rate no less than the effective per day rate for the initial inpatient stay. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
MEDICAID-MCO-DISCHARGE NOTICE
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Manar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1654&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1654.htm |