IL SB1651 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0344
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0344
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Forest Preserve District Act. Expands the authority of a forest preserve district to grant licenses, easements, and rights-of-way for construction, operation, and maintenance upon, under, or across any property of the district to include facilities for renewable energy.
Title
DOWNSTATE FOREST PRESERVE DIST
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Karina Villa [D] | Rep. Deanne Mazzochi [R] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] |
Sen. Diane Pappas [D] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0344 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-006-000 |
2019-05-22 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-05-22 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-05-22 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 026-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 805 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |