IL SB1648 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that Exceptional Quality biosolids shall not be subject to regulation as a sludge or other waste, except as provided in the Nuclear Safety Law of 2004 in relation to the authority of the Illinois Emergency Management Agency, if specified requirements are met. Provides that nothing in the Act shall limit or supersede the authority of the Illinois Emergency Management Agency under the Nuclear Safety Law of 2004. Effective immediately.
Title
EXCEPTIONAL QUALITY BIOSOLIDS
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-07-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Drycleaners |
2018-01-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Environment and Conservation |
2018-01-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - January 30, 2018 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000 |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment; 014-000-000 |
2017-05-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment; by Voice Vote |
2017-05-29 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-05-29 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment |
2017-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-28 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-04-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 22.56a | Amended Code | Citation Text |