IL SB1648 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that Exceptional Quality biosolids shall not be subject to regulation as a sludge or other waste, except as provided in the Nuclear Safety Law of 2004 in relation to the authority of the Illinois Emergency Management Agency, if specified requirements are met. Provides that nothing in the Act shall limit or supersede the authority of the Illinois Emergency Management Agency under the Nuclear Safety Law of 2004. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EXCEPTIONAL QUALITY BIOSOLIDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-31SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-31HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000
2017-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment; 014-000-000
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment; by Voice Vote
2017-05-29HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-05-29HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Environment; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment
2017-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-28HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-04-27HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2017-03-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415522.56aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback