IL SB1647 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0098
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Judicial Privacy Act. Provides that "judicial officer" includes retired justices and judges. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUDICIAL PRIVACY-RETIRED JUDGE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-11SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0098
2017-08-11SenateEffective Date August 11, 2017
2017-08-11SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-16SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-19SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000
2017-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-000-001
2017-05-17HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2017-05-17HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-000-001
2017-05-10HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Siverstein
2017-04-27SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
2017-03-08SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 011-000-000
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
705901-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback