IL SB1645 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-7)
Status: Passed on August 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0420
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-7)
Status: Passed on August 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0420
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Requires a utility to waive the utility's initial credit and deposit requirements for a period of 60 days for a residential customer or applicant who is a victim of domestic violence. Provides that the domestic violence must be certified by treating medical personnel, law enforcement personnel, a State's Attorney, the Attorney General, or a domestic violence shelter. The certification letter must be printed on the certifying entity's letterhead or accompanied by a letter on the certifying entity's letterhead that identifies the certifying individual.
Title
UTIL-DOMESTIC VIOLENCE VICTIMS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0420 |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs 053-000-000 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-05-28 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Public Utilities Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2015-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-04-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2015-04-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 012-000-000 |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2015-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2015-04-20 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 014-000-000 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |