IL SB1644 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $300,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the State Board of Education for the assessment of physical fitness levels of students. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
$ISBE-ASSESS PHYSICAL FITNESS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-12 | Session Sine Die | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-13 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Appropriations I | |
2009-02-20 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-19 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1644&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/PDF/09600SB1644.pdf |