IL SB1642 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2020-2021 school year, the curriculum of a driver education course must include instruction on bicycle and pedestrian safety, which must include, but is not limited to, instruction on how to safely pass a cyclist on the road, special considerations while driving in urban areas and near bicycle lanes, how to navigate an intersection with pedestrians and cyclists, exiting a vehicle without endangering pedestrians and cyclists, and the requirement that drivers exercise due care to avoid collision with a bicyclist or pedestrian on the road. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that, for the purpose of educating prospective licensees on the potential dangers caused by motor vehicles to pedestrians, bicyclists, in-line skaters, scooter riders, skateboarders, and other non-motorized vehicles, the Secretary of State shall include, in the Illinois Rules of the Road publication, information on bicycle and pedestrian safety.
Title
DRIVR ED-BIKE&PEDSTRIAN SAFETY
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Peters [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Donald DeWitte [R] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] |
Rep. Delia Ramirez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-002-001 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2019 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-24.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 2-112 | Amended Code | Citation Text |