IL SB1640 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a guidance counselor may not intentionally solicit or accept any gift from any prohibited source or solicit or accept a gift that would be in violation of any federal or State statute or rule, with exceptions; defines terms. Provides that a guidance counselor is not in violation of the prohibition if he or she promptly takes reasonable action to return the gift to the prohibited source or donates the gift or an amount equal to its value to an appropriate charity that is exempt from income taxation under the Internal Revenue Code of 1986. Provides that a guidance counselor or prohibited source who intentionally violates the prohibition is guilty of a business offense and is subject to a fine of at least $1,001 and up to $5,000.
Title
SCH CD-COUNSELOR-GIFT BAN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0327 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Rose |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 012-000-000 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 011-003-000 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |