IL SB1640 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that a petitioner may petition the circuit court to expunge the records of his or her arrests and charges not initiated by arrest when each arrest or charge not initiated by arrest sought to be expunged resulted in the underlying conduct being later decriminalized.
Title
EXPUNGEMENT-DECRIMINALIZATION
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |