IL SB1639 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Personnel Code. Provides that no person may be appointed from any eligible list unless that person becomes a resident of the State of Illinois within 3 months from the first day of employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PERSONNEL-STATE RESIDENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 010-000-000
2019-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fine
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-000-000
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2019-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass State Government; 009-000-000
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
204158b.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback