IL SB1639 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0509
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0509
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Welfare Act. Provides that certain disclosure requirements apply to the sale or exchange of each dog and cat within the State (rather than the sale of dogs and cats by pet shop operators). Provides that, if there is an outbreak of distemper, parvovirus, or any other contagious and potentially life-threatening disease affecting more than 2 dogs at a seller's pet shop or kennel within a 60-day period, then the seller shall provide each customer that purchases a dog a written notice stating the nature of the outbreak, and shall notify the State Veterinarian of the outbreak within 2 business days after becoming aware that a third animal has contracted the disease. Provides that a customer who purchased a dog from a seller is entitled to a remedy if certain conditions relating to a disease, illness, condition, or death of the dog are met. Sets forth conditions that a customer shall meet to obtain a remedy from a seller and a timeframe in which the seller shall provide a reimbursement to the customer. Provides that a customer may not be entitled to a remedy if the customer fails to meet certain requirements. Provides that a seller may contest a remedy sought by a customer. Provides that if a customer and seller do not reach an agreement within 10 business days, then the parties may agree to binding arbitration or the customer may bring suit in a court of competent jurisdiction. Changes certain references from "pet shop operator" to "seller".
Title
ANIMAL WELFARE-PUPPY LEMON LAW
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-19 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0509 |
2013-08-19 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-19 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 044-013-001 |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 044-013-001 |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-003-000 |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-003-000 |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 28, 2013 |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2013-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-049-000 |
2013-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2013-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2013-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 011-005-000 |
2013-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-05-20 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2013-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2013-05-14 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2013-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-02 | House | First Reading |
2013-05-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2013-05-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 031-018-006 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 1, 2013 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2013 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2013 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 008-005-001 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Executive |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Executive |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Labor and Commerce |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor and Commerce |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Labor and Commerce |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Labor and Commerce |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Labor and Commerce |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 605 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 605 | 3.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |