IL SB1638 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities in Illinois. Requires the governing board of each public university to provide to each enrolled student, at the time the student declares or changes his or her academic major or program of study, a report that contains relevant, independent, and accurate data related to the student's major or program of study and to the current occupational outlook associated with that major or program of study. Sets forth specific information the report must provide.
Title
HIGHR ED-ACADEMIC MAJOR REPORT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0214 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 111-000-000 |
2021-05-14 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 14, 2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 015-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 120 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 520 | 100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 660 | 5-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 665 | 10-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 670 | 15-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 675 | 20-215 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 680 | 25-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 685 | 30-220 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 690 | 35-215 | New Code | See Bill Text |