IL SB1637 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0326
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0326
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Open Space Lands Acquisition and Development Act. Provides that at least 50% of any grant made to a unit of local government under the Act must be paid to the unit of local government at the time the Department awards the grant. Provides that the remainder shall be distributed quarterly on a reimbursement basis. Effective immediately.
Title
OPEN LAND-GRANT REIMBURSEMENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-12 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0326 |
2013-08-12 | Senate | Effective Date August 12, 2013 |
2013-08-12 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-05-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly Burke |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 015-000-000 |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2013-04-24 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2013-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2013 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 008-002-000 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
525 | 35 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |