IL SB1635 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Departments of State Government Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. In provisions concerning expedited licensure for service members and spouses, provides that each director of a department that is created under this Code and that issues an occupational or professional license is authorized to and shall issue a temporary provisional license to any qualified service member or spouse thereof during the expedited 60-day license application review period. Provides that a provisional license shall be issued by the department to any qualified service member or spouse thereof meeting specified requirements during the application review period regardless of whether the service member or the spouse currently resides in this State.
Title
MILITARY EXPEDITED LICENSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 5 | 5-715 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1635&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1635.htm |