IL SB1634 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Agriculture Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Agriculture shall make resources available for future and existing community gardens and farms located within urban areas of the State that seek to screen or test the soil for contaminants that could pose a hazard to human health.
Title
AGR-COMMUNITY GARDENS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |