IL SB1631 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-27 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-27 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Probation and Probation Officers Act relating to the use of moneys in the probation and court services Fund. Provides that the Administrative Office of the Illinois Courts may permit a county or circuit to use its probation and court services fund for the payment of salaries of probation officers and other court services personnel whose salaries are reimbursed under the Act in any State fiscal year that the appropriation for reimbursement to counties for probation salaries and services is less than the amount appropriated to the Supreme Court for these purposes for State Fiscal Year 2002. Effective immediately.
Title
PROBATION-CT SERVICES-FUND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-29 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-27 | Senate | Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 25, 2011 |
2011-08-26 | Senate | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2011-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 041-007-000 |
2011-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 006-000-000 |
2011-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law |
2011-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2011-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 29, 2011 |
2011-05-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2011-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-038-000 |
2011-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 006-000-000 |
2011-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2011-05-19 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-19 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-18 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2011-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-05-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2011-04-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-14 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-14 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2011-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | To Criminal Law Subcommittee on Special Issues |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 110 | 15.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |