IL SB1629 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that, except for in a county with a population of at least 3,000,000 or where election judges are selected by election commissioners, an election authority may reduce the number of judges of election in each precinct from 5 to 3 for any election. Provides that in certain cities, villages, and incorporated towns with a board of election commissioners, the board shall select and choose no less than 3 (rather than choose 5) persons as judges of election for each precinct. Effective immediately.
Title
ELECT CODE-ELECTION JUDGES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-17 | Senate | To Executive- Elections |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steven M. Landek |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 13-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 13-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 14-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1629&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1629.htm |