IL SB1628 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Securities Law of 1953. Provides that every registered dealer, limited Canadian dealer, Internet portal, and investment adviser shall provide to the Secretary of State, upon request, such accounts, correspondence, memoranda, papers, books, and records as the Secretary of State may by rule prescribe, that it possesses and that it preserves for periods of longer than 3 years.
Title
SECURITIES RECORDS 3+ YEARS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 5 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |