IL SB1628 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 007-002-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMUNITY CARE-MEDICAID ENROLL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 007-002-000
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 094-017-001
2018-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-25HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-18HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Aging Committee; 012-001-000
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Aging Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Aging Committee
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Aging Committee
2018-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 038-012-001
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Martinez
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 006-002-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 009-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Human Services
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Human Services
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-03-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-03-01SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-02-28SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
201051Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback