IL SB1627 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that any qualified not-for-profit agency for persons with significant disabilities entering into a contract with the State for supplies and services under specified provisions shall offer a minimum hourly wage to its employees that is set at or above the State minimum wage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROCUREMENT-MINIMUM WAGE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-03-09SenateAssigned to Labor
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3050045-35Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback