IL SB1627 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0411
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0411
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Eliminates the amendatory changes made by Public Act 100-574 to the Code. Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that a movant may present a meritorious claim under this section if the allegations in the petition establish each of the following by a preponderance of the evidence: (1) she was convicted of a forcible felony; (2) her participation in the offense was a direct result of her suffering from post-partum depression or post-partum psychosis; (3) no evidence of post-partum depression or post-partum psychosis was presented by a qualified medical person at trial or sentencing, or both; (4) she was unaware of the mitigating nature of the evidence or, if aware, was at the time unable to present this defense due to suffering from post-partum depression or post-partum psychosis, or, at the time of trial or sentencing, neither was a recognized mental illness and as such she was unable to receive proper treatment; and (5) evidence of post-partum depression or post-partum psychosis as suffered by the person is material and noncumulative to other evidence offered at the time of trial or sentencing and it is of such a conclusive character that it would likely change the sentence imposed by the original court. Provides that the new provision is inoperative 2 years after its effective date. Provides that nothing in the new provision prevents a person from applying for any other relief under the Civil Practice Law or any other law otherwise available to her. Defines "post-partum depression" and "post-partum psychosis".
Title
CRIM PRO-POST PARTUM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0411 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date August 16, 2019 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 017-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 122-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 2-1401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |