IL SB1626 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0919
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0919
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Lawn Care Products Application and Notice Act. Makes changes to the requirements of lawn markers. Makes changes to the requirements for notification of persons before the application of lawn products.
Title
LAWN CARE PRODUCTS APPLICATION
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Rep. Emily McAsey [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0919 |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Effective Date December 30, 2016 |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-12-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2016-12-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 051-000-000 |
2016-12-01 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2016-11-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000 |
2016-11-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-11-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-11-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 29, 2016 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-11-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2016-11-16 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2016-11-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-15 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2016-11-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-11-15 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emily McAsey |
2016-11-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2016-11-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
2016-11-09 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2015-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 012-001-000 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2015 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Commerce and Economic Development; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 65 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |