IL SB1624 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-27SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-04-26SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-05SenatePostponed - Public Health
2017-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Subcommittee on Long Term Care
2017-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Long Term Care
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Public Health
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2017-03-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-03-07SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210451-101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback