IL SB1619 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board shall include in their evidence-based curriculum standards for cases of sexual assault and sexual abuse specific techniques on interviewing minors. Provides that the evidence-based curriculum standards for cases of sexual assault and sexual abuse specific shall be required for probationary police officers and all law enforcement officers (rather than only for law enforcement officers who conduct sexual assault and sexual abuse investigations).
Title
POLICE-INTERVIEWING MINORS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (LG) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 705 | 10.21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1619&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1619.htm |