IL SB1614 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act. Provides that an heir or agent who files an unclaimed property claim in which the decedent's property does not exceed $100 may submit an affidavit attesting to the heir's or agent's capacity to claim in lieu of submitting a certified copy to verify a claim. Provides that the affidavit shall be accompanied by a copy of other documentary proof that the State Treasurer requests. Provides that the State Treasurer may change the maximum value by administrative rule. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RUUPA-DECEDENT-SMALL AMOUNT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-23SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-27HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-26HouseArrived in House
2019-03-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-001
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateDo Pass Financial Institutions; 006-000-000
2019-03-06SenatePostponed - Financial Institutions
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
765102615-904Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback