IL SB1614 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Removes provisions providing the Secretary of State authority to cancel a license or permit of a person who has failed to pay fees owed to the Illinois Commerce Commission or has been convicted of a sex offense as defined in the Sex Offender Registration Act. Removes a provision providing that the reporting requirements for public officials to the Secretary shall apply to a truant minor in need of supervision, an addicted minor, or a delinquent minor whose driver's license has been ordered suspended. Provides that the Secretary may suspend or revoke the license or permit of someone who has been convicted of violating a provision in the Criminal Code of 1961 or the Criminal Code of 2012 relating to criminal trespass of vehicles if the violation involves operating the vehicle. Removes various provisions allowing the Secretary to suspend or revoke an individual's license or permit. Provides that a person who, based on the changes in the bill, becomes eligible for a driver's license, State identification card, or permit, may petition the Secretary for reinstatement of his or her license, identification card, or permit. Removes other provisions. Repeals Sections concerning suspension of a driver's license of a person convicted of theft of motor fuel and suspension of driving privileges for failure to satisfy fines or penalties for toll violations or evasions. Makes conforming changes.
Title
VEH CD-LICENSE-SUSPENSION
Sponsors
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] |
Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-208.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-704.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-205.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-208.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-306.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-306.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-308 | Amended Code | Citation Text |