IL SB1614 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes appropriations to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2021. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$DCEO

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-16SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2021-03-09SenateTo Appropriations- Business Regulations and Labor
2021-03-09SenateAssigned to Appropriations
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback