IL SB1612 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Cannabis Regulation and Tax Act. Provides that to pay any claim for death, injury, or property damage that may be brought against a dispensing organization or retail store, under any theory of recovery, arising from the on-premises consumption of cannabis, the dispensing organization or retail store authorized or permitted by a unit of local government to allow on-site consumption must carry liability insurance coverage in amounts not less than the maximum liability amounts set forth in specified provisions of the Liquor Control Act of 1934 for liability insurance coverage regarding the sale of alcoholic liquor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CANNABIS-LIABILITY INSURANCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-03-17SenateTo Executive- Cannabis
2021-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41070555-25Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback